Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Disclosing Sexual Harassment in the Workplace Act of 2018
Sponsored by
Senators Zucker, Middleton, Astle, Benson, Conway, Feldman, Guzzone, King, Lee, and Peters
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 739
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that, except as prohibited by federal law, a provision in certain employment contracts, policies, or agreements that waive certain rights or remedies to a claim of sexual harassment or certain retaliation is null and void as being against the public policy of the State; requiring employers with 50 or more employees to submit a certain survey to the Commission on Civil Rights; requiring the Commission to make the survey responses accessible to the public by posting certain information on the Commission's website; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1596
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {697172/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Disclosing Sexual Harassment in the Workplace Act of 2018
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {603498/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Klausmeier, Benson and Reilly)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Klausmeier, Benson and Reilly)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Valderrama, Aumann and Clippinger)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Valderrama, Aumann and Clippinger)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Conference Committee Report {733322/1 Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Conference Committee Report {733322/1 Adopted
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-1)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Disclosing Sexual Harassment in the Workplace Act of 2018
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 739
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Disclosing Sexual Harassment in the Workplace Act of 2018
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Sexual Harassment - Contractual Waivers and Reporting Requirements
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments {697172/1 Adopted 48B
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48B
Text - Third - Disclosing Sexual Harassment in the Workplace Act of 2018
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48C
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Economic Matters 50
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable with Amendments {603498/1 Adopted 61A
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61A
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 62
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Senate Requests House Recede 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Klausmeier, Benson and Reilly) 64
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 67
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Senate Requests House Recede 67
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Klausmeier, Benson and Reilly) 67
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 House Refuses Recede 67
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Valderrama, Aumann and Clippinger) 67
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 House Refuses Recede 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Valderrama, Aumann and Clippinger) 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Conference Committee Report {733322/1 Adopted 67
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 67
House 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Conference Committee Report {733322/1 Adopted 70
House 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-1) 70
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Disclosing Sexual Harassment in the Workplace Act of 2018
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 739
Text - Chapter - Disclosing Sexual Harassment in the Workplace Act of 2018
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/23/2020 7:45 PM