Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Task Force on Volunteer Fire Companies and Rescue Squads
Sponsored by
Senators Serafini and Gallion
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force on Volunteer Fire Companies and Rescue Squads to review certain staffing levels and recruitment practices, evaluate the cost of training and technology, and evaluate the differences in needs of rural, suburban, and volunteer fire companies and rescue squads; requiring the Task Force to study and report its recommendations regarding staffing shortages for volunteer fire companies and rescue squads to the Governor and General Assembly by December 31, 2019; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/27/2019 2/27/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Public Safety - Task Force on Volunteer Fire Companies and Rescue Squads
Senate 3/08/2019 3/11/2019 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/21 at 12:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 11/22/2019 9:37 AM