Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Information Act - Personnel and Investigatory Records - Complaints Against Law Enforcement Officers
Sponsored by
Senators Carter and Smith
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that a record relating to a formal complaint of job-related misconduct made against a law enforcement officer is not a personnel record under certain provisions of the Public Information Act under certain circumstances; authorizing a custodian to deny inspection of certain records involving a complaint of job-related misconduct made against a law enforcement officer; authorizing a custodian to deny inspection of certain records by a complainant only under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1221
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Public Information Act - Personnel and Investigatory Records - Complaints Against Law Enforcement Officers
Senate 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Hearing 3/03 at 12:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/9/2020 2:44 PM