Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Hydroelectric Power
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering from 30 to 60 megawatts the capacity of certain hydroelectric power plants in the definition of a Tier 1 renewable source for the renewable energy portfolio standard; and extending the renewable energy portfolio standard percentage derived from Tier 2 renewable sources.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Hydroelectric Power
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Hydroelectric Power
Senate 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing canceled
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-701, 7-703 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:31 PM