Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Commission to Study Campaign Finance Law) and Senators Ferguson and Benson
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that a candidate may join a slate or continue as a member of a slate only under specified circumstances; altering limits on the aggregate amount of contributions a person may make in an election cycle; requiring that contribution limits and transfer limits be adjusted in a specified manner at specified times; providing that contributions by two or more business entities be considered as being made by one contributor under specified circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1499
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013, January 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/01/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {924233/1
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Special Order until 4/2 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {924233/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Simonaire) {253425/1 Rejected (13-30)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Pipkin) Rejected (16-25)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Pinsky) {513723/1 Rejected (8-36)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-2)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
61
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/28/2013 3/01/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/06/2013 3/07/2013 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/29/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2013 3/27/2013 Favorable with Amendments {924233/1 58
Senate 4/01/2013 3/27/2013 Special Order until 4/2 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted 58
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable with Amendments {924233/1 Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Floor Amendment (Senator Simonaire) {253425/1 Rejected (13-30) 59
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Floor Amendment (Senator Pipkin) Rejected (16-25) 59
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Floor Amendment (Senator Pinsky) {513723/1 Rejected (8-36) 59
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed (45-2) 60
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 61
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101, 13-202, 13-207, 13-208.1, 13-209, 13-214, 13-220.1, 13-222, 13-226, 13-227, 13-228, 13-234, 13-235, 13-240, 13-301, 13-304, 13-305, 13-306, 13-307, 13-309, 13-309.1, 13-309.2, 13-327, 13-331, 13-340, 13-505, 13-604.1, 14-101, 14-102, 14-103, 14-104, 14-105, 14-106, 14-107, 14-108, 14-109, 2-102, 5-303, 9-207 )
Last Updated: 1/23/2020 7:40 PM