Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Physical and Digital Infrastructure in the Public Schools - Assessment
Sponsored by
Senators Rosapepe, Bates, Conway, Currie, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kagan, Kelley, King, Lee, Madaleno, McFadden, Peters, Ramirez, Salling, Simonaire, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education, on or before December 1, 2016, and in cooperation and coordination with local school systems in the State, to conduct an assessment of the physical and digital infrastructure needed, on or before December 31, 2019, to support the integration of digital devices into the State's education program for all public school students; and requiring the assessment be submitted to specified committees of the General Assembly by December 15, 2016.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {324533/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Hearing 4/11 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/16/2016 2/17/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/18/2016 2/19/2016 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/19/2016 2/19/2016 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/06/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable with Amendments {324533/1 Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 61
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 64
House 4/09/2016 4/09/2016 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 4/09/2016 4/09/2016 Hearing 4/11 at 9:00 a.m.
House 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM