Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
University of Maryland Strategic Partnership Act of 2016
Sponsored by
Senators Ferguson, Miller, Currie, DeGrange, Guzzone, King, Madaleno, Manno, McFadden, and Peters
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 25
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Formalizing a strategic partnership between specified higher education institutions to be called the University of Maryland; requiring the University System of Maryland to maintain and enhance a coordinated Higher Education Center for Research and Graduate and Professional Study in the Baltimore area based on the joint graduate and research programs of specified State institutions; requiring the presidents of the University of Maryland campuses to implement a plan that promotes collaboration between specified campuses; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1607
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/18/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {209338/1
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {209338/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-10)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {754966/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/30 (Delegate O'Donnell) Withdrawn
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (92-44)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (31-13)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 25
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/17/2016 2/18/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/18/2016 2/19/2016 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/19/2016 2/19/2016 Hearing 3/01 at 8:30 a.m.
Senate 3/08/2016 3/09/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Favorable with Amendments {209338/1 40
Senate 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted 40
Senate 3/10/2016 3/10/2016 Favorable with Amendments {209338/1 Report Adopted 41
Senate 3/10/2016 3/10/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41
Senate 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Third Reading Passed (33-10) 42
House 3/14/2016 3/11/2016 First Reading Appropriations 43A
House 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2016 3/29/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/29/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable with Amendments {754966/1 Report Adopted 56
House 3/29/2016 3/24/2016 Motion Special Order until 3/30 (Delegate O'Donnell) Withdrawn 56
House 3/29/2016 3/24/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56
House 3/30/2016 3/25/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (92-44) 57
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Senate Concur - House Amendments 56
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Third Reading Passed (31-13) 56
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Passed Enrolled 56
Post Passage 4/07/2016 4/07/2016 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 25
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9.5-202 )
(   11-113, 2-101 )
(   4-208 )
(   10-209, 11-105, 12-101, 12-104, 12-105, 12-106, 12-109, 12-116, 12-301 through 12-306, 13-101, 13-102, 13-103, 13-104, 13-201, 13-202, 13-204, 13-205, 13-301, 13-401, 13-501, 13-503, 13-505, 13-513, 13-702, 13-703, 13-802, 13-803, 13-804, 17-302, 18-113, 18-2201, 18-2205, 18-2901, 18-304, 18-404, 18-503, 18-506, 18-601, 18-603.1, 18-604, 18-708, 18-901, 4-402 )
(   1-116, 7-316 )
(   13-1101, 13-1303 )
(   1-208 )
(   4-11A-03, 4-11A-03.2, 4-11C-01, 8-2A-03 )
(   9-1405, 9-1406, 9-2203, 9-2204, 9-603 )
(   16-205.1, 2-103, 2-103.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM