Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Progressive Education Center Playground
Sponsored by
Senator Gladden
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 9:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Bond Bill Fact Sheet
Synopsis
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt in the amount of $150,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Board of Directors of The Progressive Education Center, Inc. for the acquisition, planning, design, construction, repair, renovation, reconstruction, and capital equipping of a playground for the Progressive Education Center, located in Baltimore City; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds, subject to a requirement that the grantee provide and expend a matching fund; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1613
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/17/2016 2/18/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/01/2016 3/02/2016 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Hearing 3/12 at 9:00 a.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 11/6/2019 4:13 PM