Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration)
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the distribution of motor fuel tax revenue; reducing specified motor fuel tax rates on July 1, 2013; requiring that specified motor fuel tax rates be increased on July 1 of each year based on the percentage growth in the Consumer Price Index; requiring a specified sales and use tax equivalent rate to be added to specified motor fuel tax rates and collected in the same manner as the motor fuel tax; etc.
Committees
Original:
Rules
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1515
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013, June 1, 2015
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
By Request of the Governor
Contingency - on federal, state, or local action
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/04/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/04/2013 3/04/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-1103, 2-1302.2, 2-1303, 9-305, 9-306 )
(   13-954, 3-216, 3-217, 7-208, 8-613.3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM