Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Aid for Critical Services - County Maintenance of Effort Requirements
Sponsored by
Senators Manno, King, Madaleno, and Peters
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each county, beginning in fiscal year 2015, to appropriate at least the same amount of local funds to specified categories of critical services as the county appropriated in the prior fiscal year; requiring the Secretary of Budget and Management to withhold specified State aid if a county does not meet specified maintenance of effort requirements in specified categories of critical services; requiring the Secretary to disburse specified withheld State aid if specified maintenance of effort requirements are met; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/04/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/04/2013 3/04/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/06/2013 3/07/2013 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   23-503 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM