Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Issuance of Summonses and Arrest Warrants and Restrictions on Pretrial Release
Sponsored by
Senator Shank
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Synopsis
Prohibiting a District Court commissioner from issuing a summons if the defendant is charged with a specified crime of violence; prohibiting a commissioner from authorizing the pretrial release of a defendant charged with committing a crime while the defendant was released on bail or personal recognizance for a pending prior criminal charge; and prohibiting a commissioner from authorizing the pretrial release of a defendant charged with committing a crime while on parole.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Shank) Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Referred Senate Rules
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/21/2013 3/19/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/21/2013 3/19/2013 Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Shank) Adopted 50
Senate 3/21/2013 3/19/2013 Referred Senate Rules 50
Senate 3/26/2013 3/27/2013 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM