Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Linked Deposit Programs for Small Businesses and Minority Business Enterprises
Sponsored by
Senator Middleton
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 345
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the minimum interest rate that a loan may have in order to qualify under certain linked deposit programs; altering the interest rate that the State Treasurer may accept in making specified interest bearing deposits; authorizing the State Treasurer to make specified interest bearing deposits in any financial institution without specified security under specified circumstances; and providing for the termination of specified provisions of the Act.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Opposite:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Referred Senate Rules
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Hearing 4/06 at 10:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-5)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 345
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Middleton) Adopted 52
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Referred Senate Rules 52
Senate 3/26/2013 3/27/2013 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/27/2013 3/27/2013 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/02/2013 4/03/2013 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Second Reading Passed 60
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 61
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 62
House 4/05/2013 4/05/2013 Rereferred to Economic Matters
House 4/05/2013 4/05/2013 Hearing 4/06 at 10:30 a.m.
House 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 67
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Second Reading Passed 67
House 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Third Reading Passed (135-5) 68
Senate 4/08/2013 4/06/2013 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 345
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM