Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations
Sponsored by
Senator Peters
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 595
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Amending certain prior authorizations of State Debt to alter the requirement that certain grantees provide certain matching funds; extending the deadline for certain grantees to present certain evidence that a matching fund will be presented; extending the termination date of certain grants; changing the locations of certain capital projects; altering the purposes of certain grants; changing the names of certain grantees; altering the authorized uses of certain grants; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Appropriations
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Peters) Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Senator Peters) Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {739132/1 Adopted
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (131-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 595
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/06/2020 3/06/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Peters) Adopted 45
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Senator Peters) Adopted 45
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Referred Budget and Taxation 45
Text - First - Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments {739132/1 Adopted 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51A
Text - Third - Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 52
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Referred Appropriations 51
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 53
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (131-0) 53
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53C
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 595
Text - Chapter - Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2013, 2014, 2015, 2016, 2017, 2018, 2019 )
Last Updated: 7/29/2020 5:30 PM