Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Adult Entertainment Establishments - National Human Trafficking Resource Center Hotline Information - Sign Posting Requirements
Sponsored by
Senator Lee
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the owner of an adult entertainment establishment to post the National Human Trafficking Resource Center Hotline information sign in each restroom of the adult entertainment establishment in a specified manner; requiring an agency that determines a specified violation has occurred to notify the owner of the adult entertainment establishment or the owner's agent of the violation; providing a maximum civil penalty of $1,000 for each restroom without the specified notification; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/18/2016 2/19/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-207, 19-103 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM