Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health General - Milk Products - Direct-to-Consumer Sale of Raw Milk
Sponsored by
Senator Jennings
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 11:00 a.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Excluding specified sales of raw milk from specified State regulation of milk products; creating an exception to the prohibition against the sale of raw milk; authorizing the sale of raw milk directly to the consumer in accordance with specified requirements; restricting the authorization to sell raw milk directly to the consumer to specified persons; requiring testing of specified animals; prohibiting the sale of raw milk unless a specified contract is executed; requiring specified testing of specified animals; etc.
Committees
Original:
Rules
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1015 Session: 2009 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2014
Legislative Date
2/28/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/27/2014 2/28/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/06 at 11:00 a.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-403, 21-434, 21-501 through 21-516 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM