Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Reverse Mortgages - Property Tax and Insurance Payments - Notice
Sponsored by
Senator Ready
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a borrower under a reverse mortgage loan to designate a person to whom specified notice must be sent by the reverse mortgage lender; requiring a reverse mortgage lender to send a copy of a specified notice to a person designated by the reverse mortgage borrower; requiring a reverse mortgage lender to send a specified notice to a reverse mortgage borrower and a specified person designated by the borrower 30 days after the lender makes a payment for specified property taxes or insurance; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2017
Legislative Date
2/17/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Reverse Mortgages - Property Tax and Insurance Payments - Notice
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/17/2017 2/17/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Reverse Mortgages - Property Tax and Insurance Payments - Notice
Senate 2/21/2017 2/22/2017 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/20/2017 3/20/2017 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2017 3/23/2017 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   12-1206 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page