Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business Occupations - Real Estate Appraisers - Criminal History Records Checks
Sponsored by
Senator Feldman
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 79
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring applicants for a license or certificate to provide real estate appraisal services to apply for a national and State criminal history records check, submit a complete set of fingerprints, and pay the fees for the records checks; requiring the Criminal Justice Information System of the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services to provide the records and a specified receipt of the application to the State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Feldman) Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Referred Senate Rules
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/08/2014
Legislative Date
4/08/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 79
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Feldman) Adopted 41
Senate 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 Referred Senate Rules 41
Senate 3/12/2014 3/13/2014 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/13/2014 3/13/2014 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/13/2014 3/14/2014 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 45
Senate 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Second Reading Passed 45
Senate 3/17/2014 3/12/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 46
House 3/18/2014 3/15/2014 First Reading Economic Matters 51
House 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/31/2014 3/24/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 60
House 3/31/2014 3/24/2014 Second Reading Passed 60
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 61
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 4/08/2014 4/08/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 79
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-101, 16-303, 16-306, 16-505, 16-508, 16-701 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM