Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington County - Business Licenses - Repeal of Zoning Certification Requirement
Sponsored by
Washington County Senators
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 471
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the prohibition on the clerk of the Circuit Court for Washington County from issuing a specified business license under specified circumstances unless the applicant submits to the clerk a certification that the location of the business for which the license is sought has proper zoning; and repealing a specified prohibition on the clerk of the Circuit Court of Washington County endorsing a change in a place of business in Washington County until specified zoning requirements are met.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 471
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/29/2016 3/01/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/09/2016 3/10/2016 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/10/2016 3/10/2016 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/17/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 47
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Second Reading Passed 47
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 48
House 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Economic Matters 51
House 3/22/2016 3/22/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/06/2016 4/07/2016 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 63
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Second Reading Passed 63
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 65
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 471
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   17-302, 17-307 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM