Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public School Employees - Required Training on Retirement Benefits
Sponsored by
Senator Oaks
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 8:30 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education to establish a training program for specified public school employees regarding available retirement benefits; requiring the Department to offer the training to public school employees at least once per year; requiring the Department to work in consultation with staff from the State Retirement Agency and staff from the Maryland Supplemental Retirement Plans to provide the training program; requiring public school employees to attend the training each year; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1171
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public School Employees - Required Training on Retirement Benefits
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Public School Employees - Required Training on Retirement Benefits
Senate 2/23/2017 2/24/2017 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Hearing 3/16 at 8:30 a.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-122 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM