Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Neshante and Chloe Davis Domestic Violence Prevention Task Force
Sponsored by
Senators Muse, Astle, Bates, Benson, Brochin, Cassilly, Conway, Currie, DeGrange, Eckardt, Edwards, Feldman, Ferguson, Gladden, Guzzone, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Kagan, Kasemeyer, King, Klausmeier, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Middleton, Nathan-Pulliam, Norman, Peters, Pinsky, Pugh, Ramirez, Raskin, Ready, Reilly, Rosapepe, Salling, Serafini, Simonaire, Waugh, Young, Zirkin, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 606
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Neshante and Chloe Davis Domestic Violence Prevention Task Force; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving specified compensation, but authorizing reimbursement of specified expenses; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly regarding domestic violence prevention strategies and policies on or before December 1, 2016; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {528276/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/19/2016
Legislative Date
5/19/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 606
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/01/2016 3/02/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/09/2016 3/10/2016 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/29/2016 3/30/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Favorable with Amendments {528276/1 Report Adopted 55
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 56
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 58
House 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 69
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Second Reading Passed 69
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 70
Senate 4/12/2016 4/08/2016 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/19/2016 5/19/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 606
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM