Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Appropriations and Public–Private Partnerships – Transit Lines – Three–Station Requirement
Sponsored by
Senators Pinsky and Peters
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting an officer or a unit of State government from using an appropriation for the construction of a transit line unless the transit line will have at least three stations in the State; prohibiting certain reporting agencies from entering into a public-private partnership agreement for the purpose of delivering a transit line unless the transit line will have at least three stations in the State; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Appropriations and Public–Private Partnerships – Transit Lines – Three–Station Requirement
Senate 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10A-101, 10A-403, 7-239 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM