Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County - Marinas Infested With Midges - Funding for Larvicide
Sponsored by
Senator Salling
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Natural Resources, in consultation with the Department of Agriculture, to provide financial assistance for the purchase of larvicide to an owner of a public or private marina in Baltimore County that is located on waters of the State and is infested with midges; and limiting financial assistance under the Act to no more than 50% of the cost of the purchase of larvicide.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {164336/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
58
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/28/2016 3/29/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Favorable with Amendments {164336/1 Report Adopted 54
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 55
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 58
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM