Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Elevator Inspections - Testing
Sponsored by
Senator Manno
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that a specified test on an elevator unit performed in connection with an inspection required by specified provisions of law, the Safety Code, or a regulation adopted by the Commissioner be performed by a specified licensed elevator mechanic; and requiring a State inspector or third-party qualified inspector be physically present to witness that the specified test has been correctly performed and verify the proper recording of the result of a specified test on an elevator unit.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/21/2016 3/21/2016 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-806 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM