Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Internet Consumer Privacy Rights Act of 2017
Sponsored by
Senators Rosapepe, Lee, Astle, Benson, Conway, Currie, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kagan, Kasemeyer, Kelley, King, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Middleton, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Peters, Pinsky, Ramirez, Robinson, Smith, Young, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Referred Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Making it an unfair or deceptive trade practice under the Maryland Consumer Protection Act for an Internet service provider to sell or transfer for marketing purposes a consumer's personally identifying information without the consumer's express and affirmative permission; requiring the Joint Committee on Cybersecurity, Information Technology, and Biotechnology to monitor the enforcement and impact of provisions of the Act on consumers, Internet service providers, and other businesses in the State; requiring a specified report; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted (33-14)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted (33-14)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Internet Consumer Privacy Rights Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Committee Amendment {397075/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/10 (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {307576/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Internet Consumer Privacy Rights Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (34-13)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Delegate Frick) Adopted (116-18)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
68
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 First Reading Finance
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted (33-14) 58
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted (33-14) 58
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Referred Finance 58
Text - First - Internet Consumer Privacy Rights Act of 2017
Senate 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Committee Amendment {397075/1 Adopted 61
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Motion Special Order until 4/10 (Senator Middleton) Adopted 61
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Favorable with Amendments Adopted 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Floor Committee Amendment {307576/1 Adopted 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Text - Third - Internet Consumer Privacy Rights Act of 2017
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (34-13) 63
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 68
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Delegate Frick) Adopted (116-18) 68
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Referred Economic Matters 68
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-101, 13-301, 13-321 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM