Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Background Information for Firearm License Investigations - School Crisis Welfare Officers (School Safety Act 2018: Prevention)
Sponsored by
Senators Astle, Miller, and Waugh
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 11:30 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of State Police to request certain assistance from certain officials, the courts of the State, and health care facilities in the State in conducting an investigation of an applicant for a certain firearm license; establishing the Workgroup on Accurate and Integrated Background Information on Applicants for Firearm Licenses to study how investigations for applicants for firearms licenses are conducted and to recommend the best methods for obtaining the most comprehensive information on applicants; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Waugh) Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Referred Senate Rules
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 11:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Waugh) Adopted 45
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Referred Senate Rules 45
Text - First - Public Safety - Background Information for Firearm License Investigations - School Crisis Welfare Officers (School Safety Act 2018: Prevention)
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/20/2018 3/20/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/23 at 11:30 a.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-121, 5-121.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:37 PM