Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety – School Mental Health Services and Mental Disorder Weapon Restraining Order (School Safety Act of 2018: Anticipation)
Sponsored by
Senators Waugh and Miller
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 11:30 a.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a certain prohibition on making certain threats to commit or cause to be committed a crime of violence; requiring the State Department of Education to develop a certain model policy for the establishment of a threat assessment team by January 1, 2019; authorizing a certain petitioner, under certain circumstances, to file a petition for a certain restraining order alleging that, due to a mental disorder, a certain respondent is a danger to self or the person or property of another; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Waugh) Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Referred Senate Rules
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 11:30 a.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Waugh) Adopted 45
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Referred Senate Rules 45
Text - First - Public Safety – School Mental Health Services and Mental Disorder Weapon Restraining Order (School Safety Act of 2018: Anticipation)
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/20/2018 3/20/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/23 at 11:30 a.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-1001 )
(   7-125, 7-126, 7-127, 7-303 )
(   10-1501 through 10-1511, 10-632, 4-306, 4-307 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:37 PM