Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Maryland Safe to Learn Act of 2018
Sponsored by
Senators Klausmeier, Miller, Waugh, Serafini, Edwards, Astle, Bates, Currie, DeGrange, Eckardt, Ferguson, Guzzone, Manno, Salling, Kasemeyer, King, Lee, Madaleno, Mathias, McFadden, Middleton, Nathan-Pulliam, Peters, Pinsky, Ramirez, Reilly, Rosapepe, Zucker, Hershey, and Jennings
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 30
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Center for School Safety to collaborate with certain persons and entities to provide a comprehensive approach to school safety; requiring the School Safety Subcabinet to develop a model policy for building assessment teams; requiring the development of a training curriculum for school resource officers and other school security employees; authorizing the Safe Schools Fund to provide grants to local school systems to enhance school safety; requiring a $10,000,000 annual appropriation to the Fund for certain purposes;etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Waugh) Adopted 45
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Referred Senate Rules 45
Text - First - Education – School Safety Protection Standards and Grant Program – Established (School Safety Act of 2018: Protection)
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/04/2018 4/04/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable with Amendments {829138/1 Adopted 61
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Floor Committee Amendment {789735/1 Adopted 61
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Floor Committee Amendment {939631/1 Adopted 61
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Floor Amendment {223621/1 (Senator Klausmeier) Rejected (5-40) 61
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Motion Special Order until 4/5 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 61
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Floor Amendment {193529/1 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 62
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Floor Amendment {703025/2 (Senator Hough) Adopted (25-20) 62
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Floor Amendment {703523/1 (Senator Hough) Adopted 62
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Floor Amendment {393226/1 (Senator Salling) Adopted 62
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Floor Amendment {503124/1 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 62
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Floor Amendment {543527/1 (Senator Madaleno) Adopted 62
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Floor Amendment {843425/1 (Senator Madaleno) Rejected (18-26) 62
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Text - Third - Maryland Safe to Learn Act of 2018
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted 62A
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 62A
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 61A
House 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/07/2018 4/07/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable with Amendments {865662/1 Adopted 64
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Floor Committee Amendment {655168/1 Adopted 64
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/09/2018 4/01/2018 Floor Committee Amendment {945267/1 Adopted 66
House 4/09/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0) 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 65
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-1) 65
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Safe to Learn Act of 2018
Post Passage 4/10/2018 4/10/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 30
Text - Chapter - Maryland Safe to Learn Act of 2018
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-123, 4-318, 7-1501 through 7-1503, 7-1502.1, 7-1504, 7-1505, 7-1506, 7-1507 through 7-1511, 7-1512 )
(   4-201, 4-314.1 )
(   3-101, 3-520, 4-201, 4-202, 4-203, 4-204 )
(   17-106 )
Last Updated: 11/6/2019 4:18 PM