Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0370
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - On-Premises Promotions and Product Sampling - Holders of Manufacturer's Licenses
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0520 (SB1068)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Auxiliary Winery Permit
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0550 (SB0410/CH0068)
Title
Distillery License Holders - Sale of Product to Participants in Guided Tours
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0598
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Distribution and Sales Tax Revenues
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0616
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Class 1 Distillery Licenses
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0733 /CH0627
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Multiple Manufacturer's Licenses - Sampling, Sale, and Consumption of Products
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0739 /CH0628
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Nonprofit Beer Festival Permit - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0749
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Sale of Powdered Alcohol - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0931
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Warehouse Shopping Clubs - Beer or Wine Licenses
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1196
Title
Civil Action - Wrongfully Selling or Furnishing Alcoholic Beverages
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1239
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Class 5 Brewery License - On-Premises Consumption
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1316 /CH0308
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Class 9 Limited Distillery Licenses
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1337 /CH0310
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Liquor - Manufacturer's and Wholesaler's Licenses and Permits
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1366
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Issuance of Class A Licenses
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0410 /CH0068 (HB0550)
Title
Distillery License Holders - Sale of Product to Participants in Guided Tours
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0587 /CH0564
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Sale of Powdered Alcohol - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0630 /CH0418
Title
Comptroller - Distillery Off-Site Permit and Liquor Festival Permit
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0724 /CH0041
Title
Alcoholic Beverages Article
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0725 /CH0228
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Cross-References and Corrections
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1064
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Issuance of Class A Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1068 (HB0520)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Auxiliary Winery Permit
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0370 Alcoholic Beverages - On-Premises Promotions and Product Sampling - Holders of Manufacturer's Licenses Delegate Barkley 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0520 (SB1068) Alcoholic Beverages - Auxiliary Winery Permit Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0550 (SB0410/CH0068) Distillery License Holders - Sale of Product to Participants in Guided Tours Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0598 Alcoholic Beverages - Distribution and Sales Tax Revenues Delegate Frick 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB0616 Alcoholic Beverages - Class 1 Distillery Licenses Delegate Barkley 2 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0733 /CH0627 Alcoholic Beverages - Multiple Manufacturer's Licenses - Sampling, Sale, and Consumption of Products Delegate Barkley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 627
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0739 /CH0628 Alcoholic Beverages - Nonprofit Beer Festival Permit - Revisions Delegate Barkley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 628
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0749 Alcoholic Beverages - Sale of Powdered Alcohol - Prohibition Delegate Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway)
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0931 Alcoholic Beverages - Warehouse Shopping Clubs - Beer or Wine Licenses Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1196 Civil Action - Wrongfully Selling or Furnishing Alcoholic Beverages Delegate Angel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1239 Alcoholic Beverages - Class 5 Brewery License - On-Premises Consumption Delegate Barkley 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1316 /CH0308 Alcoholic Beverages - Class 9 Limited Distillery Licenses Delegate Arentz 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 308
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1337 /CH0310 Alcoholic Beverages - Liquor - Manufacturer's and Wholesaler's Licenses and Permits Delegate Barkley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 310
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1366 Alcoholic Beverages - Issuance of Class A Licenses Delegate Barkley 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0410 /CH0068 (HB0550) Distillery License Holders - Sale of Product to Participants in Guided Tours Senator Ferguson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 68
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0587 /CH0564 Alcoholic Beverages - Sale of Powdered Alcohol - Prohibition Senator Madaleno 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 564
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0630 /CH0418 Comptroller - Distillery Off-Site Permit and Liquor Festival Permit Senator Hershey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 418
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0724 /CH0041 Alcoholic Beverages Article President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 41
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0725 /CH0228 Alcoholic Beverages - Cross-References and Corrections President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 228
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1064 Alcoholic Beverages - Issuance of Class A Licenses Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1068 (HB0520) Alcoholic Beverages - Auxiliary Winery Permit Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM