Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Delegate Herb McMillan

District
30A
County
Anne Arundel
Committee Assignment(s)
Annapolis Info
164 House Office Building
6 Bladen Street
Annapolis, MD 21401
Phone 410-841-3211 | 301-858-3211
Toll-free in MD
Fax 410-841--3386
Interim Info
164 House Office Building
6 Bladen Street
Annapolis, MD 21401
Phone 410-841-3211 | 301-858-3211
Fax 410-841--3386
Contact
herb.mcmillan@house.state.md.us
Party
Republican
Tenure
First elected to the Maryland House of Delegates, 2002. Member of the House, January 8,2003 to January 10, 2007. Re-elected to the House in 2010. Member of the House January 12, 2011 to January 14, 2015 representing District 30, Anne Arundel County. Representing District 30A, Anne Arundel County, beginning January 14, 2015.
Current Assignments
2015 Chief Deputy Minority Whip
2015 Health and Government Operations Committee
2015 Public Health & Minority Health Disparities of the Health and Government Operations Committee
2015 Insurance Subcommittee of the Health and Government Operations Committee
Past House Service
Environmental Matters Committee, 2011-2015; Housing and Real Property Subcommittee of the Environmental Matters Committee, 2011-2015; Motor Vehicles and Transportation Subcommittee of the Environmental Matters Committee, 2011-2015; Judiciary Committee, 2003-2007; Family Law Subcommittee of the Judiciary Committee, 2003-2007.
Public Service
State Commission on the Capital City, 2011-; Chair, Capital Projects/Bond Bill Subcommittee, Anne Arundel County Delegation, 2011-; Education Subcommittee, Anne Arundel County Delegation, 2003-2007; Task Force to Study the Feasibility of Licensing Boaters, 2003; Annapolis City Council, Representing Ward 5, 1997-2001; Economic Matters Committee, Annapolis City Council, 1997-2001; Housing and Human Welfare Committee, Annapolis City Council, 1997-2001; Rules Committee, Annapolis City Council, 1997-2001.
Memberships
Maryland Veterans Caucus, 2011-.
Biographical Information
Born, Knoxville, Tennessee, May 30, 1958 ; Knoxville Catholic High School, 1976 ; U.S. Naval Academy, B.S., History, 1980 ; Central Michigan University, graduate studies , Public Administration, 1989-90 ; Served in U.S. Navy (Active Duty, 1980-91, U.S. Naval Reserve, 1991-, Navy Commendation Medal, 1988) ; Pilot, American Airlines, 1991- ; Married, Four children .
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM