Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 23

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
SB0990
    (HB1420)
Alcoholic Beverages - Direct Wine Shipping - Means of Transmitting OrdersSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0955 / CH0589Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers - Class 5 Manufacturer's LicenseSenator BrinkleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 589Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0827
    (HB0660)
Streamlined Tax Administration Act of 2013Senator GaragiolaIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)Finance
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
SB0806
    (HB1172)
Alcoholic Beverages Sales - Prohibition on Use of Self-Scanning Cash RegistersSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0755
    (HB0704)
Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Breweries - Annual Production LimitSenator ColburnIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0260
    (HB0074)
Alcoholic Beverages - Consumption of Wine Not Bought from License HolderSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0223 / CH0207
    (HB0231)
Alcoholic Beverages - Class 7 Limited Beer Wholesaler's LicenseSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 207Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0032 / CH0168
    (HB0004 / CH0169)
Alcoholic Beverages - Brewery License - On-Premises ConsumptionSenator ColburnApproved by the Governor - Chapter 168Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
HB1420
    (SB0990)
Alcoholic Beverages - Direct Wine Shipping - Means of Transmitting OrdersDelegate BarkleyIn the House - Rereferred to Economic MattersEconomic Matters
HB1416Alcoholic Beverages - Vaportinis and Similar Devices - ProhibitedDelegate BarkleyIn the House - Rereferred to Economic MattersEconomic Matters
HB1366Alcoholic Beverages - Class CS Chain Store LicensesDelegate BarnesIn the House - Rereferred to Economic MattersEconomic Matters
HB1172
    (SB0806)
Alcoholic Beverages Sales - Prohibition on Use of Self-Scanning Cash RegistersDelegate ValderramaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0978 / CH0396Alcoholic Beverages - Winery Off-Site Permit and Wine Festival PermitDelegate BarkleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 396Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0704
    (SB0755)
Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Breweries - Annual Production LimitDelegate Haddaway-RiccioIn the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0701Alcoholic Beverages - Repeal of Obsolete Provisions of LawDelegate BarkleyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0660
    (SB0827)
Streamlined Tax Administration Act of 2013Delegate DavisIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0590Alcoholic Beverages - Direct Shipment - Kosher or Sacramental Wine Sold at RetailDelegate AroraIn the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0567Video Lottery Operation Licenses - Expansion to Alcoholic Beverages Licensed EstablishmentsDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
HB0404Alcoholic Beverages - Issuance of Class A, C, and D LicensesSenator FeldmanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0231
    (SB0223 / CH0207)
Alcoholic Beverages - Class 7 Limited Beer Wholesaler's LicenseDelegate SchulzVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0230 / CH0088Alcoholic Beverages - Farm Breweries and Micro-BreweriesDelegate SchulzApproved by the Governor - Chapter 88Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0074
    (SB0260)
Alcoholic Beverages - Consumption of Wine Not Bought from License HolderSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEconomic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0004 / CH0169
    (SB0032 / CH0168)
Alcoholic Beverages - Brewery License - On-Premises ConsumptionDelegate Haddaway-RiccioApproved by the Governor - Chapter 169Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.