Community Colleges - Local Bills (F4)

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 6

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
SB0410
    (HB0964 / CH0658)
Community Colleges - Cade Funding Formula - Grants for English for Speakers of Other Languages ProgramsSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0147
    (HB0290)
Chesapeake College - Authorization of Debt for Capital Projects - Simple Majority Plus One RequirementSenator ColburnIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0146
    (HB0266)
Chesapeake College - Board of Trustees - Appointment of MembersSenator ColburnIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0964 / CH0658
    (SB0410)
Community Colleges - Grants for English for Speakers of Other Languages ProgramsDelegate HixsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 658Ways and Means
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0290
    (SB0147)
Chesapeake College - Authorization of Debt for Capital Projects - Simple Majority Plus One RequirementCaroline County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0266
    (SB0146)
Chesapeake College - Board of Trustees - Appointment of MembersCaroline County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.