HB0132 (CH0614)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

State Government - Pollinator Habitat Plans

Sponsored by:

Delegate Lafferty

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 614


Synopsis:Requiring the Department of Natural Resources, the Maryland Environmental Service, and the State Highway Administration, in consultation with the Department of Agriculture, to each establish a specified pollinator habitat plan by July 1, 2017, and to make each plan available to the public on each State agency's web site by September 1, 2017; requiring specified State agencies to report to specified committees of the General Assembly by January 1, 2018, on the implementation of each pollinator habitat plan; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Lafferty, Healey, Lierman, S. Robinson, Carr, and Bromwell
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Committee(s):
Environment and Transportation  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Agriculture
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Narrow Subject(s):Agriculture, Department of
Agriculture -see also- Farmland
Bees
Birds
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Conservation -see also- Soil Conservation
Electronic Government
Environmental Matters -see also- Conserv; Nat Resrce; Pollut
Environmental Service, Maryland
Farmland
Foresters
Highway Administration, State
Insects -see also- Bees
Natural Resources, Department of
Public Information
Reports
Trees
Statutes:Article - Agriculture
(2-1701)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 24, 2016 3:34 P.M.