Commercial Law - Generally (I4)

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
SB0634 / CH0302
    (HB1127 / CH0303)
Commercial Law - Self-Service Storage FacilitiesSenator PetersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 302Finance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0425
    (HB1068)
Commercial Law - Cigarette Sales Below Cost - Wholesale MarkupSenator AstleIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0116Commercial Law - Cancellation of Sales of Motor Vehicles and Internet SalesSenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
HB1215 / CH0408Consumer Protection - Home Appliances and Warranty Enforcement - StudyDelegate WalkerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 408Economic Matters
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1127 / CH0303
    (SB0634 / CH0302)
Commercial Law - Self-Service Storage FacilitiesDelegate JamesonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 303Economic Matters
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1068
    (SB0425)
Commercial Law - Cigarette Sales Below Cost - Wholesale MarkupDelegate JamesonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
HB0502Owner or Operator of Livery Stable - Lien on Dairy AnimalDelegate GlassIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0458Personal and Business Documents - EvidenceDelegate NiemannIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.