Agriculture (M4)

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 30

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitlePrimary Sponsor StatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
SB0053 / CH0171Department of Agriculture - Administrative Review of Contested CasesChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 171Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/15/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0180 / CH0027Department of Agriculture - State Chemist FundChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 27Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0820 / CH0561
    (HB0767 / CH0562)
Animal Welfare - Spay/Neuter Fund - EstablishmentSenator BensonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 561Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1026 / CH0598
    (HB1388)
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Study of Honey-Related Licenses and PermitsSenator ColburnApproved by the Governor - Chapter 598Finance
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0408 / CH0258
    (SB0404 / CH0257)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Enhanced Agricultural Management EquipmentDelegate ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 258Ways and Means
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/2/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
HB1282Agricultural Land Condemnation BoardDelegate EckardtIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0767 / CH0562
    (SB0820 / CH0561)
Animal Welfare - Spay/Neuter Fund - EstablishmentDelegate FrushApproved by the Governor - Chapter 562Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0427
    (HB0796)
Income Tax Credit - Agricultural Land - Diminution in Value of Real PropertySenator GlassmanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1388
    (SB1026 / CH0598)
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Study of Honey-Related Licenses and PermitsDelegate Haddaway-RiccioIn the Senate - Rereferred to FinanceHealth and Government Operations
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
HB0561 / CH0315
    (SB0748 / CH0314)
Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Limiting ApplicabilityDelegate HubbardApproved by the Governor - Chapter 315Environmental Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1019 / CH0293
    (SB0586 / CH0292)
Task Force to Study the Implementation of a Hub and Spoke Program in the Southern Maryland RegionDelegate JamesonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 293Environmental Matters
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1091
    (SB0796)
Agriculture - Easements - Renewable Energy Generation FacilitiesDelegate JamesonIn the House - Referred to interim study by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0412
    (HB0433)
Agriculture - Lawn Care Pesticides - Child Care and School Facilities - ProhibitionSenator KingIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0775 / CH0524
    (SB0675 / CH0523)
Maryland Pesticide Reporting and Information WorkgroupDelegate LaffertyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 524Environmental Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0675 / CH0523
    (HB0775 / CH0524)
Maryland Pesticide Reporting and Information WorkgroupSenator MannoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 523Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
SB0404 / CH0257
    (HB0408 / CH0258)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Enhanced Agricultural Management EquipmentSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 257Budget and Taxation
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0586 / CH0292
    (HB1019 / CH0293)
Task Force to Study the Implementation of a Hub and Spoke Program in the Southern Maryland RegionSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 292Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0748 / CH0314
    (HB0561 / CH0315)
Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Limiting ApplicabilitySenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 314Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0796
    (HB1091)
Agriculture - Easements - Renewable Energy Generation FacilitiesSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
SB1029 / CH0339Maryland Agricultural Certainty ProgramSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 339Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0520Agriculture - Commercial Feed and Drinking Water - Antimicrobial Drug ProhibitionSenator MontgomeryIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0521Agriculture - Meat and Poultry - Antibiotic Use - LabelingSenator MontgomeryIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1327 / CH0151Agricultural Commodity - Assessment - CollectionDelegate OttoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 151Environmental Matters
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0739Agriculture - Nutrient Management Plans - Fertility Index Value Soil TestingSenator PinskyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0433
    (SB0412)
Agriculture - Lawn Care Pesticides - Child Care and School Facilities - ProhibitionDelegate Robinson, S.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0796
    (SB0427)
Income Tax Credit - Agricultural Land - Diminution in Value of Real PropertyDelegate RudolphIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0623Environment - Sediment Control - Agricultural Land Management PracticesDelegate SmigielIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0400
    (SB0364)
Agriculture - Management-Intensive Farming and GrazingDelegate SteinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0378 / CH0108Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Fund - Easement Restriction - ReimbursementDelegate StocksdaleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 108Environmental Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0364
    (HB0400)
Agriculture - Management-Intensive Farming and GrazingSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.