Taxes - Property (Q1)

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 31

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitlePrimary Sponsor StatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0062Property Tax Exemption - Surviving Spouse of a Veteran - EligibilityDelegate AumannIn the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0251Personal Property Tax - Depreciation of Assessed ValueSenator BrinkleyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0227Tax Sales - Redemption of Property - Taxes, Interest, and PenaltiesSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0161County Property Taxes - Classes of Property - Special Rates and LimitsDelegate CarrIn the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1373Public Utility Property - Operating Personal Property - DefinitionDelegate CarrIn the House - Rereferred to Economic MattersEconomic Matters
SB0158 / CH0025
    (HB0128 / CH0026)
Homestead Tax Credit - Eligibility Verification and ApplicationSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 25Budget and Taxation
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0965Homestead Tax Credit - Eligibility - Definition of Legal InterestDelegate DumaisIn the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0419 / CH0370Personal Property Tax - Liens for Unpaid TaxDelegate FrickApproved by the Governor - Chapter 370Ways and Means
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/2/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
HB0820
    (SB0893)
Municipal Property Taxes - Annual Budget Ordinance and Special RatesDelegate FrickIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1016Clean Energy Loan Programs - Private Lenders - Collection of Loan PaymentsSenator FroshIn the House - Rereferred to Economic MattersFinance
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
HB0888Task Force to Review Property Tax Assessment Procedures and the Assessment Appeals ProcessDelegate GlassIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1190 / CH0405County Property Tax - Personal Property RateDelegate HixsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 405Ways and Means
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0144 / CH0189
    (HB0263 / CH0190)
Property Tax Credit - Historically and Architecturally Valuable PropertySenator KasemeyerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 189Budget and Taxation
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0263 / CH0190
    (SB0144 / CH0189)
Property Tax Credit - Historically and Architecturally Valuable PropertyDelegate LaffertyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 190Ways and Means
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
SB0707Special Taxing Districts - Transportation Improvements and Exemption from County Tax LimitationsSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0893
    (HB0820)
Municipal Property Taxes - Annual Budget Ordinance and Special RatesSenator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0235 / CH0361Property Tax - Valuation of Residential Real Property - DatabaseDelegate McComasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 361Ways and Means
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/2/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
HB0188Retail Service Stations - Disaster Preparation - Generator Tax CreditDelegate McDermottIn the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1223Homestead Property Tax Credit - Eligibility Verification and Application - Extension and NoticeDelegate McMillanIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0830Transportation Financing ActSenator MillerIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
SB0689Property Tax Credit - Retail Service Stations - Alternate Power SourcesSenator MontgomeryIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0817Property Tax Credit - Retail Service Stations - Alternate Power SourcesDelegate MurphyIn the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1013Transportation Trust Fund - Use of Funds - Transit FinancingSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0119
    (HB0021)
Property Tax - Exemption for Blind Individuals and Surviving SpousesSenator ReillyIn the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0645Homestead Property Tax Credit - Principal Residency - Information from Motor Vehicle Administration and CountiesSenator RosapepeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1030 / CH0660Property Tax Credit - Urban Agricultural Property - DefinitionDelegate RosenbergApproved by the Governor - Chapter 660Ways and Means
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/2/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
HB0125Tax Sales - Reimbursement for Attorney's FeesDelegate StukesIn the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 2:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
HB0518Tax Sales - Redemption of Property - Payments and FeesDelegate StukesIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0919Property Tax Credit - Group Homes - Power GeneratorsDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0021
    (SB0119)
Property Tax - Exemption for Blind Individuals and Surviving SpousesDelegate VitaleIn the House - Hearing 1/16 at 11:00 a.m.Ways and Means
1/16/2013 - 11:00 a.m.
HB0128 / CH0026
    (SB0158 / CH0025)
Homestead Tax Credit - Eligibility Verification and ApplicationDelegate Washington, M.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 26Ways and Means
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.