Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 28

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
SB0987
    (HB0781 / CH0388)
Vehicle Laws - Towing or Removal of Vehicles - NoticeSenator ForehandIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0919
    (HB1089)
Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicle Companies - Right of IndemnificationSenator GaragiolaIn the Senate - Referred to interim study by FinanceFinance
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0886
    (HB1139)
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, and Factory Branches - Relationship with DealersSenator StoneIn the Senate - Second Reading Passed with AmendmentsJudicial Proceedings
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0728
    (HB0791 / CH0389)
Tax Credits - Electric Vehicles - ExtensionsSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
SB0600 / CH0064
    (HB0836 / CH0065)
Vehicle Laws - Electric VehiclesSenator GaragiolaApproved by the Governor - Chapter 64Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0485
    (HB0721)
Vehicle Laws - Excise Tax Exemptions - Leased VehiclesSenator McFaddenIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
SB0468
    (HB0556)
Vehicle Laws - Misdemeanor Violations - Unsupervised ProbationSenator ForehandIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0359
    (HB0530)
Education - School Vehicle AttendantSenator PughIn the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-3)Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0286
    (HB0284)
Vehicle Laws - School Vehicles - DefinitionSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0249Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, and Factory Branches - Retaliation Against DealersSenator ForehandIn the Senate - Third Reading Failed (20-25)Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0222
    (HB0322)
Motor Vehicle Administration - Yellow Dot ProgramSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0076Motor Vehicle Administration - Fee-Setting Authority - Miscellaneous FeesChair, Budget and Taxation CommitteeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and Taxation
SB0075 / CH0019Motor Vehicle Administration - Investigative Division - Issuance of CitationsChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 19Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1382Sentencing Procedures - Statement by Victim or Victim's Representative (Alex's Law)Delegate McDermottIn the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1339Vehicle Laws - Towing, Recovery, and Storage - Methods of PaymentDelegate MinnickIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1139
    (SB0886)
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, and Factory Branches - Relationship with DealersDelegate FrushIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesEnvironmental Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules
HB1089
    (SB0919)
Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - Required SecurityDelegate BraveboyIn the Senate - Referred to interim study by FinanceEconomic Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0836 / CH0065
    (SB0600 / CH0064)
Vehicle Laws - Electric VehiclesDelegate MaloneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 65Environmental Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0791 / CH0389
    (SB0728)
Tax Credits - Electric Vehicles - ExtensionsDelegate McHaleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 389Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0781 / CH0388
    (SB0987)
Vehicle Laws - Towing or Removal of Vehicles - NoticeDelegate GilchristApproved by the Governor - Chapter 388Environmental Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0721
    (SB0485)
Vehicle Laws - Excise Tax Exemptions - Leased VehiclesDelegate CardinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
HB0565Vehicle Laws - Baltimore City - Prohibition on Sale of Unlawful VehiclesDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0556
    (SB0468)
Vehicle Laws - Misdemeanor Violations - Unsupervised ProbationDelegate AndersonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0530
    (SB0359)
Education - School Vehicles - Authorized RidersDelegate Pena-MelnykIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsEnvironmental Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0501Motor Vehicle Administration - Multiple Copies of Driving Records - FeesDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
HB0420 / CH0113Vehicle Laws - Maryland Transportation Authority - Payment of TollsChair, Environmental Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 113Environmental Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0322
    (SB0222)
Motor Vehicle Administration - Yellow Dot ProgramDelegate Kelly, K.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0284
    (SB0286)
Vehicle Laws - School Vehicles - DefinitionDelegate BeitzelIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.