Elections, State Board of

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 26

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
SB0960Election Law - Reporting of Precinct ResultsSenator SallingIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0854
    (HB0303)
Departmental Secretaries - Campaign and Working Hour ActivitiesSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0842
    (HB1354)
Voter Registration Integrity Act of 2017Senator ReadyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0832Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly ElectionsSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0711Election Law - Elections by MailSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0406Election Law - Voting System - Digital ScannersSenator PetersIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0358
    (HB0517)
Presidential Candidate Tax Transparency ActSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0091
    (HB0169)
State Board of Elections - Open Meetings - Video Streaming and Recording (State Board of Elections Transparency Act)Senator KaganIn the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 2:15 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2017 - 2:15 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1605Election Law - Voting System - Optical Scanners in Baltimore CountyDelegate SydnorIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsElections (G1)
HB1498 / CH0851Campaign Finance - Political Organizations - Compliance and DisclosureDelegate Washington, A.Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 851Ways and Means
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1368Electricians - Local Licenses - RepealDelegate HornbergerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/6/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1363Maryland Small Donor Incentive ActDelegate MosbyIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1354
    (SB0842)
Voter Registration Integrity Act of 2017Delegate ShoemakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB0962Elections - Study Commission on the Redistricting Process in MarylandDelegate McComasIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0898 / CH0852Election Law - Campaign Finance - Coordinated ExpendituresDelegate EbersoleEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 852Ways and Means
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0539Election Law - Voter Registration and Absentee Voting - Proof of CitizenshipDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0529 / CH0786Election Law - Political Parties, Candidacy, and Campaign FinanceChair, Ways and Means CommitteeEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 786Ways and Means
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0517
    (SB0358)
Presidential Candidate Tax Transparency ActDelegate TarlauIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0353 / CH0441Election Law - Change in Administrative Policy Affecting Voting Rights - NoticeDelegate RosenbergApproved by the Governor - Chapter 441Ways and Means
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0303
    (SB0854)
Departmental Secretaries - Campaign and Working Hour ActivitiesDelegate TurnerIn the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0299Campaign Finance - Political Action Committees - Solicitation DisclosuresDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0169
    (SB0091)
State Board of Elections - Open Meetings - Audio Recordings and Documents (State Board of Elections Transparency Act)Delegate KormanIn the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth and Government Operations
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsElections (G1)
HB0143 / CH0107Elections - Miscellaneous Duties and ProceduresChair, Ways and Means CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 107Ways and Means
2/7/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0118
    (SB0632 / CH0630)
Election Law - Persons Doing Public Business - Reporting by Governmental EntitiesDelegate LuedtkeVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
2/7/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsElections (G1)
HB0073 / CH0796Election Law - Election Judges - Minimum AgeDelegate LuedtkeEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 796Ways and Means
2/7/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0072Election Law - Fair Campaign Financing FundDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:30 p.m.Ways and Means
2/7/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
Elections (G1)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:16 P.M.