HB1305

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Labor and Employment - Payment of Wages - Minimum Wage

Sponsored by:

Delegate Fennell

Status:

In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn


Synopsis:Requiring to be paid for the 6-month period beginning July 1, 2017, a minimum wage of $9.25 per hour, for the 18-month period beginning January 1, 2018, a minimum wage of $10.10 per hour, and beginning July 1, 2019, a minimum wage of $12.50 per hour.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegate Fennell
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Committee(s):
Economic Matters  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Private Sector Labor and Industry
State Government - Personnel
Narrow Subject(s):Salaries and Compensation -see also- Overtime; Reimb. Rates
Work, Labor and Employment -see also- Col Barg; Holiday; etc
Statutes:Article - Labor and Employment
(3-413)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 8, 2017 9:51 A.M.