Homeowners Associations

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 27

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0026 / CH0346
    (SB0247 / CH0347)
Real Property - Notices of Foreclosure Sale and Postponement or Cancellation of Foreclosure SaleDelegate HolmesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 346Environment and Transportation
1/24/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
HB0034 / CH0817Real Property - Homeowners Associations - Resale of Lot - Inspection FeesDelegate HolmesEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 817Environment and Transportation
1/24/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0041Real Property - Common Ownership Communities - Statewide RegistrationDelegate HolmesIn the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
1/24/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0386 / CH0444Montgomery County - Economic Development - Business Improvement Districts MC 12-17Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 444Environment and Transportation
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0496Baltimore County - Nuisance Actions - Community Association StandingDelegate SydnorIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0500Rental Units, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Smoking RestrictionsDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0607
    (SB1022)
Real Property - Vacant and Abandoned Property - Expedited ForeclosureDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0651Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies - Annual BudgetsDelegate HolmesIn the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0699
    (SB0301)
Real Property - Installation and Use of Electric Vehicle Recharging EquipmentDelegate LamIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0789 / CH0480Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Amendment of Governing DocumentsDelegate CullisonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 480Environment and Transportation
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1048 / CH0349
    (SB0875 / CH0348)
Residential Property - Notice of ForeclosureDelegate HolmesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 349Environment and Transportation
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
HB1086
    (SB0762)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Collington Station Safety and Surveillance SystemsDelegate HolmesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/11/2017 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1156Residential Property - Foreclosed Property Registry - Notice of RegistrationDelegate SteinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1192Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community ManagersDelegate DavisIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1193Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community ManagersDelegate HolmesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic MattersReal Property (N1)
HB1369
    (SB0809 / CH0481)
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Sales of Common Elements and Common AreasDelegate ProctorIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsEnvironment and Transportation
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
HB1437
    (SB1184)
Foreclosed and Vacant Residential Property - Common Ownership Communities - Payment of Regular AssessmentsDelegate ProctorIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1640
    (SB0122)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Historic Diamond Press BuildingDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/11/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0247 / CH0347
    (HB0026 / CH0346)
Real Property - Notices of Foreclosure Sale and Postponement or Cancellation of Foreclosure SaleSenator RamirezApproved by the Governor - Chapter 347Judicial Proceedings
2/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0301
    (HB0699)
Real Property - Installation and Use of Electric Vehicle Recharging EquipmentSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0530Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community ManagersSenator BensonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0762
    (HB1086)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Collington Station Safety and Surveillance SystemsSenator PetersIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 9:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0809 / CH0481
    (HB1369)
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Sales of Common Elements and Common AreasSenator MuseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 481Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0875 / CH0348
    (HB1048 / CH0349)
Residential Property - Notice of ForeclosureSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 348Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationReal Property (N1)
SB1022
    (HB0607)
Real Property - Vacant and Abandoned Property - Expedited ForeclosureSenator MathiasIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
SB1115Maryland Homeowners Association Act - Payment Plan for Fees or Charges - Written PolicySenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
SB1184
    (HB1437)
Foreclosed and Vacant Residential Property - Common Ownership Communities - Payment of Regular AssessmentsSenator MuseIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:52 A.M.