Immigrants and Citizenship

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 17

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0461Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim HelpfulnessDelegate MoralesIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (42-3)Judiciary
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1308State and Local Correctional Facilities - Undocumented Immigrants - Transfer to United States Department of Homeland Security (Keep Our Communities Safe Act of 2018)Delegate SzeligaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1326Election Law - Voter Registration and Absentee Voting - Proof of CitizenshipDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1461Criminal Procedure – Immigration – Supporting All Families Everywhere (SAFE Act)Delegate GutierrezIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1493
    (SB0526)
Labor and Employment - Regulation of Farm Labor Contractors and Foreign Labor ContractorsDelegate ValderramaIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1526
    (SB0344)
Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Police Officer Certification - Eligibility (Freedom to Serve Act)Delegate SanchezIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB1549Counties and Municipal Corporations - "Sanctuary Laws" for Illegal Aliens - ProhibitionDelegate Miller, W.In the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Public Safety (E4)
HB1589Maryland Office for Refugees and Asylees - Placement Information (Unaccompanied Alien Children Placement Transparency Act)Delegate Miller, W.In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
HB1613
    (SB1239)
Appointment or Designation of Standby Guardian - Adverse Immigration ActionDelegate SanchezIn the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
HB1626Public Information Act - Motor Vehicle Administration - Warrant or Subpoena for Personal InformationDelegate SteinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0122Criminal Law – Comprehensive Crime Bill of 2018Senator ZirkinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudicial Proceedings
1/25/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0344
    (HB1526)
Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Police Officer Certification - Eligibility (Freedom to Serve Act)Senator KaganIn the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/1/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0357Voter Registration Integrity Act of 2018Senator ReadyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0526
    (HB1493)
Labor and Employment - Regulation of Farm Labor Contractors and Foreign Labor ContractorsSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0581Victims and Witnesses – U Nonimmigrant Status – Certification of Victim HelpfulnessSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Second Reading Passed with AmendmentsJudicial Proceedings
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0881
    (HB1276)
Criminal Law - Human Trafficking and Prostitution OffensesSenator LeeIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB1239
    (HB1613)
Appointment or Designation of Standby Guardian – Adverse Immigration ActionSenator SmithIn the Senate - Returned PassedJudicial ProceedingsJudiciary
4/9/2018 - 7:30 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)

April 10, 2018 12:03 P.M.