Monuments and Memorials

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 9

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
SB0940Baltimore County and Carroll County - Authority to Place Boundary MonumentsSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsCounties - Generally (L1)
SB0934
    (HB1372 / CH0430)
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - AlterationsSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Prior Authorizations (B4)
SB0857 / CH0569
    (HB1131 / CH0570)
Commission on the Establishment of a Maryland Educators Service MemorialSenator MillerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 569Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0851Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Len Bias Statue at Northwestern High SchoolSenator RamirezIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0177
    (HB0120)
Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - The Jane Hanson National MemorialSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1372 / CH0430
    (SB0934)
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - AlterationsDelegate JonesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 430Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationPrior Authorizations (B4)
HB1247State Government - Frederick Douglass and Harriet Tubman Memorial Statues - Placement and CommissionDelegate O'DonnellIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1131 / CH0570
    (SB0857 / CH0569)
Commission on the Establishment of a Maryland Educators Service MemorialDelegate HixsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 570Ways and Means
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0120
    (SB0177)
Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - The Jane Hanson National MemorialDelegate ClagettIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.