Overtime

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 6

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitlePrimary Sponsor StatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0721
    (SB0711)
Prevailing Wage Rates Reform Act of 2016Delegate DavisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0197
    (SB0623)
Maryland Pay Stub Transparency Act of 2016Delegate LiermanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0711
    (HB0721)
Prevailing Wage Rates Reform Act of 2016Senator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0623
    (HB0197)
Maryland Pay Stub Transparency Act of 2016Senator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinancePrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0994
    (HB0401)
Labor and Employment - Equal Pay for Equal Work - RevisionsSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinancePrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0401
    (SB0994)
Labor and Employment - Equal Pay for Equal Work - RevisionsDelegate Young, K.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)

September 23, 2016 2:05 P.M.