Real Estate/Agents and Brokers

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 4

View Prior Year Legislation

Number/Chapter
(Cross File/Chapter)
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0055Business Occupations – Obligations of Real Estate Brokers – Voter RegistrationDelegate Lewis, J.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
1/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1482 / CH0078
    (SB0846 / CH0077)
State Real Estate Commission – Brokers – Business Succession in the Event of DisabilityDelegate ArentzApproved by the Governor - Chapter 78Economic Matters
3/9/2018 - 2:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1608Real Property - Trust Money - Escrow Trust AccountsDelegate MorganIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0846 / CH0077
    (HB1482 / CH0078)
State Real Estate Commission – Brokers – Business Succession in the Event of DisabilitySenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 77Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 21, 2018 10:45 A.M.