Religion

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 19

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
SB1191 / CH0732
    (HB1661)
Schools and Child Care Centers - State Grant Program - Security Upgrades for Facilities at Risk of Hate Crimes or AttacksSenator MannoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 732Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
SB1189
    (HB0890)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Ner Israel Rabbinical CollegeSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 10:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/13/2017 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB1188Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Bais Yaakov Middle SchoolSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 10:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/13/2017 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB1159
    (HB1137)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Get Involved Community CenterSenator OaksIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 3:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB1028
    (HB0985)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Harambee House Community Outreach CenterSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0388
    (HB0314)
Creation of a State Debt - Caroline County - Benedictine SchoolCaroline County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0351
    (HB0825)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Melvin J. Berman Hebrew AcademySenator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 10:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/13/2017 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1661
    (SB1191 / CH0732)
Schools and Child Care Centers - State Grant Program - Security Upgrades for Facilities at Risk of Hate Crimes or AttacksDelegate Pena-MelnykVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation - Miscellaneous (F5)
HB1590State Government - Creation and Maintenance of Religious Registry - Prohibitions and Immunity for Refusal to Provide InformationDelegate FrickIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1530Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Torah School of Greater WashingtonDelegate WaldstreicherIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/13/2017 - 11:30 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1249Corporations and Associations - Domestications - AuthorizationDelegate SydnorIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic MattersCorporations and Associations (C1)
HB1137
    (SB1159)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Get Involved Community CenterDelegate AliIn the House - Hearing canceledAppropriationsState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0985
    (SB1028)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Harambee House Community Outreach CenterDelegate BuschIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/11/2017 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0890
    (SB1189)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Ner Israel Rabbinical CollegeDelegate SteinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/13/2017 - 11:30 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0825
    (SB0351)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Melvin J. Berman Hebrew AcademyDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/13/2017 - 11:30 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0577Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Highland Park Christian AcademyDelegate Howard, C.In the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/11/2017 - 4:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0372Public Schools - Voluntary Nonsectarian Prayer at School-Sponsored Student EventsDelegate MetzgarIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0355 / CH0561Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Discrimination - Prohibited MC/PG 102-17Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 561Health and Government Operations
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Bi-County Agencies (L5)
HB0314
    (SB0388)
Creation of a State Debt - Caroline County - Benedictine SchoolDelegate GhristIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/11/2017 - 4:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:17 P.M.