SB0171 (CH0463)

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2014, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2005, 2006, 2007, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2011, 2012, and 2013

Sponsored by:

President

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 463


Synopsis:Authorizing the creation of a State Debt in the amount of $1,180,515,377, the proceeds to be used for specified necessary building, construction, demolition, planning, renovation, conversion, replacement, and capital equipment purchases of the State, for acquiring specified real estate in connection therewith, and for grants to specified subdivisions and other organizations for specified development and improvement purposes, subject to specified requirements; etc.
Analysis:Not available at this time
All Sponsors:The President (By Request - Administration)
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0161
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014, June 1, 2015, June 1, 2016, June 1, 2017, June 1, 2018, June 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
Committee(s):
Budget and Taxation Appropriations
Broad Subject(s):Capital Budget
Narrow Subject(s):Budgets -see also- Capital Budgets
Capital Budgets
State Bonds
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 2, 2015 9:05 A.M.