Trials

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 23

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitlePrimary Sponsor StatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
SB0298
    (HB0353)
Courts - Evidence of Sexually Assaultive Behavior - Admissibility (Repeat Sexual Predator Prevention Act)PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0353
    (SB0298)
Courts - Evidence of Sexually Assaultive Behavior - Admissibility (Repeat Sexual Predator Prevention Act)SpeakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0301 / CH0362
    (SB0270 / CH0363)
Courts - Evidence of Sexually Assaultive Behavior - Admissibility (Repeat Sexual Predator Prevention Act of 2018)Delegate AtterbearyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 362Judiciary
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0111 / CH0188
    (SB0233 / CH0189)
Maryland Department of Health - Defendants Found Incompetent to Stand Trial or Not Criminally Responsible - CommitmentDelegate BarronApproved by the Governor - Chapter 188Judiciary
1/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Health (J1)
SB0270 / CH0363
    (HB0301 / CH0362)
Courts – Evidence of Sexually Assaultive Behavior – Admissibility (Repeat Sexual Predator Prevention Act of 2018)Senator BrochinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 363Judicial Proceedings
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0346
    (HB1411)
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - ReinstatementSenator CassillyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0551
    (HB0749)
Vehicle Laws - Bus Lane Monitoring Cameras - AuthorizationSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0001 / CH0004
    (SB0002 / CH0003)
Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act)Delegate DumaisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 4Judiciary
1/18/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
HB0395
    (SB0423 / CH0602)
Criminal Procedure - Postconviction - DNA Testing and Petition for Writ of Actual InnocenceDelegate DumaisIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)Judiciary
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0002 / CH0003
    (HB0001 / CH0004)
Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act)Senator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 3Judicial Proceedings
1/11/2018 - 1:15 p.m.
JudiciaryFamily Law (D4)
HB1125Evidence - Chain of Custody - DNA ProfileDelegate HettlemanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1151Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring SystemsDelegate HillIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SJ0010Postconviction Review – Convictions Resulting From PleasSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0749
    (SB0551)
Vehicle Laws – Dedicated Bus Lanes – EnforcementDelegate Lewis, R.In the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsEnvironment and Transportation
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB1139Baltimore City – Vehicle Height Monitoring Systems – EnforcementDelegate LiermanIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsEnvironment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB1411
    (SB0346)
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - ReinstatementDelegate McComasIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0233 / CH0189
    (HB0111 / CH0188)
Maryland Department of Health - Defendants Found Incompetent to Stand Trial or Not Criminally Responsible - CommitmentSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 189Judicial Proceedings
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0618Criminal Law – Cruelty to Animals – Traveling Elephant ActsDelegate Miller, A.In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0005Civil Actions - Punitive Damage AwardsSenator NormanIn the Senate - Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0226 / CH0550Real Property - Wrongful Detainer and Distress Actions - Trial by JurySenator NormanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 550Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0816Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First RespondersSenator SallingIn the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0887Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Specific Individuals or Mass MurderDelegate ShoemakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0423 / CH0602
    (HB0395)
Criminal Procedure - Postconviction - DNA Testing and Petition for Writ of Actual InnocenceSenator ZirkinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 602Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 18, 2018 3:57 P.M.