HB0016 (CH0554)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Community Colleges - Near Completers and Maryland Community College Promise Scholarships

Sponsored by:

Delegate Turner

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 554


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House10/2/201710/2/2017Pre-filed
1/10/20181/10/2018First Reading Ways and Means
1/9/20181/9/2018Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20184/5/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/5/20183/27/2018Favorable with Amendments {985264/1 Report Adopted61A
Floor Amendment {383920/1 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted61A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments61A
4/6/20183/28/2018Third Reading Passed (92-40)62
Senate4/6/20184/1/2018First Reading Senate Rules63
4/9/20184/9/2018Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/9/20184/4/2018Favorable with Amendments {984432/1 Report Adopted66
Second Reading Passed with Amendments66
4/9/20184/5/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (32-14)67
House4/9/20184/4/2018House Concur - Senate Amendments69
Third Reading Passed (90-48)69
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/8/20185/8/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 554

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 8, 2018 1:36 P.M.