HB0047 (CH0199)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems Licenses – Modifications

Sponsored by:

Delegate Jameson

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 199


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House11/6/201711/6/2017Pre-filed
1/10/20181/10/2018First Reading Economic Matters
Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
2/7/20182/7/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2/8/20182/8/2018Favorable with Amendments {493998/1 Report Adopted22
Second Reading Passed with Amendments22
2/13/20182/13/2018Third Reading Passed (136-0)25
Senate2/14/20182/14/2018First Reading Finance26
3/7/20183/7/2018Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
3/26/20183/26/2018Favorable Report by Finance
3/27/20183/23/2018Favorable Report Adopted54
Second Reading Passed54
3/28/20183/24/2018Third Reading Passed (47-0)55
House3/29/20183/22/2018Returned Passed56
Post Passage4/24/20184/24/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 199

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 24, 2018 2:56 P.M.