HB0174

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Children With Disabilities - Individualized Education Program Process - Parental Consent

Sponsored by:

Delegate Luedtke

Status:

Veto sustained (0-140)


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/19/20171/19/2017First Reading Ways and Means
1/23/20171/23/2017Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
3/16/20173/16/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/16/20173/13/2017Favorable with Amendments {395765/1 Report Adopted47
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47
3/17/20173/14/2017Third Reading Passed (140-0)48
Senate3/20/20173/17/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs46A
4/5/20174/5/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/6/20173/31/2017Favorable with Amendments {214236/1 Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed with Amendments60
4/7/20174/1/2017Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)61
House4/8/20174/1/2017House Concur - Senate Amendments66
Third Reading Passed (136-0)66
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/26/20175/26/2017Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
House1/10/20181/10/2018Veto sustained (0-140)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


January 11, 2018 7:30 A.M.