HB0257 (CH0325)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Maryland Meals for Achievement In-Classroom Breakfast Program - Administration (Maryland Meals for Achievement for Teens Act of 2017)

Sponsored by:

Delegate Hixson

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 325


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/23/20171/23/2017First Reading Ways and Means
1/26/20171/26/2017Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
2/16/20172/16/2017Favorable Report by Ways and Means
2/17/20172/17/2017Favorable Report Adopted28
Second Reading Passed28
2/21/20172/21/2017Third Reading Passed (138-0)30
Senate2/22/20172/22/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs29
4/4/20174/4/2017Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/4/20173/29/2017Favorable Report Adopted58
Second Reading Passed58
4/5/20173/30/2017Third Reading Passed (46-0)59
House4/6/20173/30/2017Returned Passed64
Post Passage4/18/20174/18/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 325

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 12:59 P.M.